Governing document Westwood Community Primary School Parent Teacher and Friends Association
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 APR 2009 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAR 2013 as amended on 19 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.