Trustees BETTER ACTION FOR FAMILIES CIO
Charity number: 1154286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM OGILVIE | Chair | 24 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Greenwood | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charlton | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Broadbent | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonny Ruddette | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Hartley | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Hartley | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE BENSON | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS K IQBAL | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MS Y UGARTE | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.