Trustees LONDON SCHOOL OF MOSAIC
Charity number: 1152295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prerana Phadnis | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christie Jay Beauchamp | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neel Ramful | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lois Miller | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olga Astaniotis | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zemfira Ayton | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Lewis | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Thomas Sharkey | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Boyland | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brad Hepburn | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jushua Panda | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Zain Odho | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.