Trustees VIBRANCE
Charity number: 1152186
Charity reporting is up to date (132 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Lyons | Chair | 03 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Mark Barnes | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Amman Lever | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Binnie Goh | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Evonne Powell | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adil Ghani | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Margaret Richardson | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE ATKINS | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ALLEN | Trustee | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.