Trustees DOWNHAM MARKET & DISTRICT HERITAGE SOCIETY
Charity number: 1154267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Patch | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Dobson | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zowie Sweetland | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Hall | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marion Batt | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thorpe | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Drewry | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE AUSTIN | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Wiseman | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Anthony RYAN | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.