Trustees THE PARISH of WORTHING - CHRIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1152846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth HOBBS | Chair | 08 July 2013 |
|
|||||
Norma Carter | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Biggs | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Gwatkin | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW EGGLETON | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet ATKINSON | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Rosemary ANNING | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTHONY STEAD | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE ROBERTS | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ANN FOAN | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR JOHN BULL | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.