Trustees EALING CHURCHES WINTER NIGHT SHELTER
Charity number: 1152768
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theresa Effuah Sam | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Warren Ian McNeil | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER CHARLES BARTER | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Henryk Marszalek | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rachel Marszelek | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR NILESH PATEL | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE HARDING | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.