CASA THEATRE FESTIVAL LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes, maintains, improves and advances education and appreciation of the arts, in particular the performing arts from Latin America.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People
4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 June 2013: Standard registration
- CASA FESTIVAL; CASA LATIN AMERICAN THEATRE FESTIVAL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ana Elena Gonzalez Trevino | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Martinez Flores | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melusine Virgine Genevieve De Chazal | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Wood | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.88k | £116.60k | £51.12k | £91.61k | £175.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.23k | £144.31k | £46.16k | £93.69k | £135.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.60k | £40.00k | £24.61k | £45.65k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2018
(These accounts |
27 September 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/06/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE PERFORMING ARTS FROM LATIN AMERICA. 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Smokehouse Yard
44-46 St. John Street
LONDON
EC1M 4DF
- Phone:
- 07837 737795
- Email:
- info@casafestival.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window