Accounts and annual returns JURASSICA
Charity number: 1155839
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 07 February 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | 07 February 2018 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 15 February 2017 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | 15 February 2017 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window