Trustees WALTON COMMUNITY LIBRARY
Charity number: 1154607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN MORAN | Chair | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Penney | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meryl Smith | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Hall | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm David Wood | Trustee | 02 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Heigham | Trustee | 02 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN BRYAN HARVEY | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JIM GERVASIO | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.