Trustees GAY OUTDOOR CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 1158873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Keith CORNWELL | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ka Him Chris Ng | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Widdowson | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard George Smith | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Gabriella Giuffre | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gilbraith | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander David Barr | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hunter Voelcker | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger William Sheldon | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER BERNARD BLACKBURN | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLYSON MAY EVANS | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.