Trustees SATEDA LIMITED
Charity number: 1155163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET GARNONS-WILLIAMS | Chair | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amy Glover | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Appleby | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annette Davies | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aurelie Josephine Debaene | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Rafemoyo | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Giulia Ajello | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fitzsimons | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.