Accounts and annual returns TENDRING ELDERCARE
Charity number: 1155441
Charity reporting is overdue by 230 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 230 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 230 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2024 | 387 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2024 | 387 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2024 | 752 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2024 | 752 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2023 | 921 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 409 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 26 September 2020 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 278 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window