Trustees ASSIST SHEFFIELD
Charity number: 1154862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Leslie Quinton | Chair | 23 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Clive Last | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Anokhee Parikh | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
May Lubienski | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Pious Nyandoro | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Yap | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Godfrey Chikaviro | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joy Uwamurera | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Wood | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL MARTYN CULY HARVEY | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.