Trustees THE FRIENDS OF CREDITON ARTS CENTRE
Charity number: 1155513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF FOX | Chair | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Ingham | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glen Chudley | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tim Salter | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Cookson | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tom Blaen | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIM HARRIS | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CARTWRIGHT | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE CRONE | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BETH ROBSON | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.