Trustees LLANWRTYD & DISTRICT HERITAGE AND ARTS CENTRE
Charity number: 1157181
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Smith | Chair | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Ball | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Eifion Lloyd | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
GEORGIANA FRANCES PERRETT | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE KETTERINGHAM | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN JONES | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELLAN JONES | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER DAVIES | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PRICE | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.