Accounts and annual returns DENTON PARK ESTATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 504525
Charity reporting is overdue by 1750 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 February 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 289 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 289 days | |
Annual return | 03 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 654 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 654 days | |
Annual return | 03 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 1019 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 1019 days | |
Annual return | 03 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1384 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1384 days | |
Annual return | 03 February 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1750 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1750 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window