Trustees THE REEF-WORLD FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1157096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Hancock Fell | Chair | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nitya Teagarajan | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Petchrung Sukpong | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Giles Reed | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Russell | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Emery | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Woode | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Harry Greenhalgh | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Florence Stephenson | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim Good | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.