Governing document FLOREAT EDUCATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/01/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/07/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: • PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR SUCH PURPOSES INCLUDING BY PROMOTING AND DISSEMINATING MODELS OF GOOD PRACTICE AND BY THE DELIVERY OF SUPPORT SERVICES GENERALLY TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS; • ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WHO WORK OR VOLUNTEER IN, OR GOVERN, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THOSE PERSONS TO DELIVER A HIGH QUALITY EDUCATION TO THE PUPILS AND COMMUNITIES SERVED BY THOSE INSTITUTIONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.