Trustees COLNE VALLEY RAILWAY PRESERVATION LTD
Charity number: 1157665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Lemon | Chair | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Martin Jonathan Smith | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David James Clews | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Monksfield | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart John Clark | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Claydon | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lemon | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Hall | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY BELINDA HALLS | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.