Trustees CHRIST CHURCH YARDLEY WOOD CENTRE
Charity number: 504661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lydia Madeleine Gaston | Chair | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Hough | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Darwood | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Barnes | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Ann Bond | Trustee | 03 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.