Trustees DUXFORD SATURDAY WORKSHOP TRUST
Charity number: 1157262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Stephen Inglis | Chair | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JOAN KERRY | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Haughan | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Mahony | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr DANIEL RICHARD LEGGATE | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL MARION SMITH | Trustee | 11 November 2006 |
|
|
||||
JANET LAURA MACLEOD | Trustee | 01 September 1995 |
|
|
||||
GREG SMITH | Trustee | 01 September 1985 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.