Trustees KING'S GUARD OFFICERS' MESS
Charity number: 1158087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lieutenant Colonel Charles Michael James Foinette | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Major General James Maurice Hamilton Bowder OBE | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Brigadier Mark Simon Peter Berry | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Lieutenant Colonel Gareth Colin Light | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
James Andrew Campbell Campbell-Johnston | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
DESMOND SHANE SPENCER CHICHESTER | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.