Trustees BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF MUSEUMS
Charity number: 1159670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL CALLEY | Chair | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kathleen Jones | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Lloyd Hughes | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Gillian Fergusson | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Margaret Stebbing | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Timothy Craven | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
PAUL DAVID JOHN HOWITT-COWAN | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
David Adgar | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
JEAN CAROLE KNIGHT | Trustee | 17 October 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
KATE KUHN | Trustee | 28 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.