Governing document UMAR COMMUNITY EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1161195
Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/01/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR THE SUNNI DOCTRINE OF HANAFI DEOBANDI FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.