Trustees SILCOATES SCHOOL
Charity number: 1158796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hunter | Chair | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Siddique Patel | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Euan West | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jason McCullagh | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Crozier | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jeffery | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Tibbetts | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN LINGARD | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Vincent Willings | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EDWARD PAYLING MA ACA | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.