Accounts and annual returns THE FULL BLESSINGS OF GOD APOSTOLIC CHURCH
Charity number: 1158585
Charity reporting is overdue by 1717 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 256 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 256 days | |
Annual return | 03 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 621 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 621 days | |
Annual return | 03 January 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 986 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 986 days | |
Annual return | 03 January 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1351 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1351 days | |
Annual return | 03 January 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1717 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1717 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window