Trustees SEAFORD MUSEUM & HERITAGE SOCIETY
Charity number: 1158790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Christine Lawson | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH CONSTANCE MARR | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Richard Purkis | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Malcolm Leigh | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Selina Ruth White | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Hing | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Patricia Haggis | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mary Keel | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clement Laurence Collins CPFA | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.