Trustees NEW YATT RIDING FOR THE DISABLED
Charity number: 1158969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Helen Clarke | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Judith Holly Jackson | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Arica Stella Mason | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Phillips | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Atkinson | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annie Stockford | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Cripps | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr SANDRA EINIG | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER STOWELL | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.