Trustees TRI SERVICES AND VETERANS SUPPORT CENTRE
Charity number: 1159599
Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF HARRIMAN | Chair | 12 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Colin Critchlow | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Robinson | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevan Miller | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
kathy munslow | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALDERMAN MRS SANDRA HAMBLETON | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Darryl John Gough | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP MEREDITH | Trustee | 12 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK KNOWLES | Trustee | 12 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.