Trustees CHIAROSCURO GLBT
Charity number: 1160613
Charity reporting is overdue by 957 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHANIE MARSHALL | Chair | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Davarin | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Scott Mosher | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carole Jean Brown | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KARL SHEEN | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHANE WESLEY ALDERTON | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.