Trustees SURVIVORS IN TRANSITION
Charity number: 1159782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHLEEN HUGHES | Chair | 29 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Patrick Tucker | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jover | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damien Ribbans | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vanessa Webb | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DEWHURST | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MANN | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr EMMA MARRIOTT | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.