Trustees SOLIHULL COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 505527
Charity reporting is up to date (101 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Iris Butterworth | Chair | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Fear | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Neil Budd | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Malcolm Thomas | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Richardson | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Davis | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Ian Webb | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Swindell | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVID BAYNES | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|||||
MAT SPENCER | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLLR KENNETH IAN MEESON | Trustee |
|
||||||
GREG DODD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.