Trustees FRIENDS OF ANFIELD
Charity number: 1161476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Little-Smith | Chair | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda McDermott-Kennedy | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN PRENTICE | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ALISTAIR HARRY DONE | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terrence Cave | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karan Lawlor | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cathie Bradburn | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAY BEETON | Trustee | 16 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Dowling | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MARSHALL CMLI | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BILL MCGARRY | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
TOM BRADBURN | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.