Trustees HOME-START KERNOW
Charity number: 1159948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Anne Gould | Chair | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wigglesworth | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Irvine | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hastings | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNA KATE CAIRNS | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Law | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul John Thornton | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Duncan Trotter | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.