Trustees FRIENDS OF UPMINSTER WINDMILL
Charity number: 1162180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Leonard Sainsbury | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alfred Shaw | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Warren Alan George Lyons | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justin Christopher Coombs | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Sach | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Conway | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JAMES WITHERS | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Keith Wilkinson | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STEVEN KEMP | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.