Governing document NORTHUMBERLAND HOSPITAL RADIO (INCORPORATING RADIO WANSBECK HOSPITAL BROADCASTING)
Charity number: 506123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 1976 AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 1977, 4 FEBRUARY 1990, 13 DECEMBER 1992, 27 FEBRUARY 1996 AND 29 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A RADIO BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.