Accounts and annual returns KIDNEY PATIENTS HOLIDAY FUND (NORTHERN COUNTIES)
Charity number: 506210
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 481 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 15 January 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 15 August 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window