Financial history KIDNEY PATIENTS HOLIDAY FUND (NORTHERN COUNTIES)
Charity number: 506210
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.49k | £38.48k | £4.54k | £2.78k | £10.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.46k | £12.12k | £4.91k | £2.91k | £3.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.