Accounts and annual returns SAWA FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1164807
Charity reporting is overdue by 1231 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 135 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 135 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 501 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 501 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 866 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 866 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1231 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1231 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window