Trustees SUSSEX CRICKET FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1162649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR Ish Jalal | Chair | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Bandy | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abidine Sakande | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John RT Barclay | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Libby Ager | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katy Cooper | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andy Dalby-Welsh | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL RUSSELL | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gary Stanley | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Brian Dumigan | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.