Trustees KILPECK VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 506412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOYCE DAVIES | Chair | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dave Thompson | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Foster | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bradley | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Morrison | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES RUSH | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Murray | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Murray | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARK PARSONS | Trustee | 23 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.