Trustees BURBAGE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUNDS CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Charity number: 1163221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William TITMUSS | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMON DOVE | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul LARSMON | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane BROWN | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Frank Moore | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE DRUMMOND FELLOWS | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE CLARKE | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keith Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE LESLEY ANGELL | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.