Dogfen lywodraethu BEVERLEY COMMUNITY LIFT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/03/1979 AS AMENDED ON 08/06/1999 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/2006 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 01/08/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF BEVERLEY AND ALL SURROUNDING AREAS PLUS POCKLINGTON AND HIGH WOLDS AND ALL SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
THE TOWN OF BEVERLEY AND ALL SURROUNDING AREAS PLUS POCKLINGTON AND HIGH WOLDS AND ALL SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.