Governing document THE HEATON WOODS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1977 AND AMENDED 27 JUNE 2002, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 21 OCTOBER 2004 AND BY ORDER OF 7 NOVEMBER 2006. AS AMENDED ON 06 APR 2017 as amended on 01 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ACQUIRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRIVATE WOODLANDS AND ADJACENT LANDS IN AND NEAR THE VALLEY KNOWN AS HEATON WOODS TO CONSERVE, PROTECT AND PROMOTE THOSE LANDS AND THE WHOLE OF HEATON WOODS AND ADJACENT LANDS AND TO ENCOURAGE THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT THEREOF.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.