Trustees ARCHIVE OF MARKET AND SOCIAL RESEARCH
Charity number: 1166619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Barwise | Chair | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Whaley Jr | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Dacre Patrick McDonald | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Langhamer | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phyllis Macfarlane | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Blyth | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Frost | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN SPENCER BRACE | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHYLLIS VANGELDER MA, FMRS | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADAM IVOR CARGILL PHILLIPS MA, FMRS | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CAMPBELL PATTERSON | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER ALAN BARTRAM MA, FMRS | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAZ KHAN BSC, FMRS | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.