Trustees FRIENDS OF GEDLING COUNTRY PARK
Charity number: 1167205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY LOCK | Chair | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jules Handford | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Manley | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Shelton | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Green | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE TAYLOR | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR ROD FILLIINGHAM | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Aplin | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Marson | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNY FILLINGHAM | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICK BENEDEK | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN OSBORNE | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
TONY KEYWORTH | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.