Trustees FERRING VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1167736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Frank Cornish | Chair | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Gough | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Andy Player | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Bubloz | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Young | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Charlotte Dawn Monroe | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Cockram | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Griffin | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jackson | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Dilks | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANNE FORDYCE | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
Betty McCann | Trustee | 01 January 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.