Trustees NORTH WESSEX DOWNS LANDSCAPE TRUST
Charity number: 1168708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Cayzer-Colvin | Chair | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Broadhead | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES CHRISTOPHER BRUCE MATHEW | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Brew | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER LEMON | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
EDWIN JAMES STALLIBRASS HISCOCKS | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.