Governing document PARTNERSHIP FOR OBSERVATION OF THE GLOBAL OCEAN
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 20 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED ON 27 JUL 2018 AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 31 JAN 2020 AMENDED ON 23 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE OF GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY - ADVANCING EDUCATION IN GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION BY IDENTIFYING AREAS OF FURTHER STUDY FOR DEVELOPING THE SCIENCE OF GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION - THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH - THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND RESEARCH FELLOWSHIPS - THE PROMOTION OF INNOVATION AND TECHNOLOGY IN THE SCIENCE OF GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.